pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Incorporated
LandSAR NZ
CC11286
9429042682783
Registered

Registration details

7/10/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 13182
Armagh
Phillipstown
Christchurch
8141
Unit 8, 35 Sir William Pickering Drive
Burnside
Christchurch
8053

Charity's other details

03 374 2424


Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Incorporated
New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Training Limited
Search and Rescue Institute New Zealand (SARINZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

LandSAR NZ is a national volunteer organisation which provides land search and rescue services to lost, missing and injured all over New Zealand. Our volunteers operate in suburban, urban, wilderness and rural areas including regional and forest parks, shorelines and caves. Our unpaid professionals offer their specialist search and rescue skills free to the public 24 hours a day, 7 days a week via the New Zealand Police and the Rescue Coordination Centre.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Emergency / disaster relief

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Visitors to New Zealand

Entity Structure

We have over 3,000 trained search and rescue volunteers who are members of 61 local groups covering the length and breadth of New Zealand. There are also 18 specialist teams such as LandSAR Search Dogs, LandSAR Caving, Alpine Cliff Rescue and Swift Water Rescue who operate on a local level where there is a requirement for these specialist skills.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 Member of 'New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2021 Member of 'New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2018 22/08/2018 $2,758,082 $2,741,627
30/09/2017 20/07/2017 $2,511,268 $2,351,952
30/09/2016 8/09/2016 $2,221,253 $2,259,273
30/09/2015 24/08/2015 $1,414,222 $1,263,288
28/02/2015 18/12/2014 $2,679,925 $2,465,949
28/02/2014 9/12/2013 $2,367,560 $2,425,312

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Megan Kate Dimozantos Director 30/10/2021
Charlotte Aronsen Board Member 2/12/2020
Julian Tovey Board Member 2/12/2020
Camilla Clare Mary Owen Board Member 19/10/2019
Craig John Wells Board Member 19/10/2019
Wayne David Stevens Board Member 19/10/2019
Graham Mark Pomeroy Board member 10/06/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Iain Watson Board Member 30/10/2021
David Robertson Board Member 10/10/2020
Roger Terry Blumhardt Board Member 10/10/2020
Malcolm Inglis Board Member 3/10/2018
Siobhan Quayle Board member 3/10/2018
Steven Caldwell Chief Executive Officer 18/08/2017
Greg Bishop Board Member 10/06/2017
Rex David Hendry Board Member 10/06/2017
Ronald George Smith Board Member 10/06/2017
Jaimes Wood Board Member 31/07/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/11/2021 NOC030
21/10/2020 NOC029
21/08/2020 NOC028
10/01/2020 NOC027
31/10/2019 NOC026
20/03/2019 NOC025
9/10/2018 NOC024
28/09/2018 NOC023
14/03/2018 NOC021
7/09/2017 NOC020

Charity Documents