Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Revive Afghanistan NZ
Al Kareem Welfare
CC59835
9429050057733
Registered

Registration details

9/11/2021
March 31

Address for service

24A Marshall Laing Avenue
Mount Roskill
Auckland
1041

Charity's other details

facebook.com/reviveafghanistan
instagram.com/reviveafghanistan

Asia

Afghanistan


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To create sustainable projects which aid in humanitarian relief for the homeless and those less fortunate than us which provide basic amenities, including food, clothing, and shelter.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Community development

General public

Entity Structure

We have a head office based in Auckland. Our trust deed states that we must have a minimum of two and no more than five trustees. Currently, we have two trustees that constitute our governance board and they have been selected based on their skills and ability to contribute to our overall purpose.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 30/09/2023 $241,142 $174,432 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 28/08/2022 $35,873 $24,060 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mohammed Faroq Nasim Trustee 9/11/2021
Sibghatullah Safi Trustee 9/11/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/08/2022 NOC002
24/05/2022 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.