pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Idea Services Limited
CC22489
9429037016166
Registered

Registration details

2/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

c/- Duncan Cotterill
PO Box 10376
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
c/- Duncan Cotterill, Level 2
50 Customhouse Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04) 472 2247
(04) 472 0429


Group Members


Below are all the members of IHC New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Accessible Properties Limited
Accessible Properties New Zealand Limited
Choices New Zealand Limited
Enabling Good Lives Limited
Idea Services Limited
IHC Limited
IHC New Zealand Incorporated
Integral New Zealand Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charitable objects of IHC New Zealand Incorporated generally, and in particular to establish and maintain vocational, residential, recreational and community services for persons with an intellectual disability and their families.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

People with disabilities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Employment, Promotion of volunteering, Vocational, Family support

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Adults

Entity Structure

NZ limited company which is a wholly owned subsidiary of IHC New Zealand Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2021 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $280,336,000 $280,090,000
31/12/2015 11/12/2015 $272,925,000 $267,269,000
31/12/2014 27/01/2015 $266,309,000 $259,863,000
31/12/2013 9/01/2014 $248,780,000 $249,826,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jean O'Callaghan Director 26/08/2021
Cherie McConville Director 11/06/2021
Vicki Owen Director 11/06/2021
Ralph Vincent Jones Group Chief Executive 7/12/2020
Anthony John Shaw Director 31/10/2019
Barbara Joan Rocco Director 31/10/2019
Susanne Kay Win Director 31/10/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lynne Marie Lane Director 21/01/2022
Andrew Hardwick Evans Director 20/08/2021
Ralph Jones Chief Executive 7/12/2020
Neil Alexander Taylor Director 3/12/2020
Pauline Alice Winter Director 22/10/2020
Michael Francis Quigg Director 31/03/2020
Shelley Payne Director 7/09/2018
Donald Thompson National President 7/09/2017
Lynne Renouf Vice President 12/07/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/02/2022 NOC026
29/09/2021 NOC024
21/09/2021 NOC023
30/08/2021 NOC022
28/06/2021 NOC021
25/06/2021 NOC020
4/02/2021 NOC019
29/01/2021 NOC017
29/01/2021 NOC016
29/01/2021 NOC015

Charity Documents