pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Leukaemia & Blood Cancer New Zealand
CC24498
9429042778035
Registered

Registration details

18/05/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Leukaemia And Blood Foundation Of New Zealand 19/05/2008
Leukaemia & Blood Cancer New Zealand 1/01/2012

Address for service

PO Box 99182
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
6 Claude Road
Epsom
Auckland
1023

Charity's other details

(09)6383556
(09)6383557
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/LBCNZ
Twitter icon image
www.twitter.com/LBCNZ
www.youtube.com/LBFNZ and www.instagram.com/LBCNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

With a vision to cure and a mission to care patients and families affected by blood cancers and related blood conditions Leukaemia & Blood Cancer New Zealand (LBC) is a national organisation providing: patient support programmes, research funding, advocacy, awareness and information.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, We support patients and families affected by leukaemia at all ages and ethnic groups

Entity Structure

The organisation has two divisions and one subsidiary. It has 9 trustees, 32 employees including 7 senior managers. – this is based on the annual accounts as at 31st March 2021.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Leukaemia & Blood Cancer Endowment Fund CC50277

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 26/08/2021 $8,650,758 $7,432,439
30/09/2020 26/08/2020 $7,441,060 $7,002,861
30/09/2019 22/08/2019 $7,565,558 $7,237,734
30/09/2018 3/09/2018 $6,480,321 $6,142,965
30/09/2017 30/08/2017 $7,911,096 $6,232,103
30/09/2016 11/09/2016 $6,532,876 $5,651,357
30/09/2015 23/10/2015 $6,070,107 $5,538,002
30/09/2014 21/11/2014 $6,086,924 $5,246,210
30/09/2013 23/08/2013 $5,187,537 $4,513,800

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Fale Andrew Lesa Trustee 1/04/2021
Matthew James Roberts Trustee 1/04/2021
Mark Kevin Radburnd Trustee 21/08/2019
Edwin Thomas Fletcher Trustee 20/02/2019
Shai Virendra Patel Trustee 20/02/2019
Peter Fergusson CEO 14/05/2018
Andrew McKenzie Trustee 15/10/2014
Tony Wilding Trustee 1/08/2012
Pene Milne Chairman 1/12/2011
Peter Browett Trustee 27/04/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Arthur Loo Trustee 31/03/2021
Hilary Blacklock Trustee 31/03/2021
Glenn Victor Williams Trustee 17/04/2019
Blair Wingfield Trustee 29/08/2018
Pru Etcheverry Chief Executive Officer 6/04/2018
Rachel Lerner Trustee 21/10/2015
Greg Moyle Trustee/Deputy Chairman 16/04/2014
Arthur Pitcher Trustee 12/10/2011
James Douglas Strong Trustee 12/10/2011
Cheryl Willetts Trustee 4/08/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/07/2021 NOC025
22/06/2021 NOC024
26/04/2019 NOC021
25/02/2019 NOC020
7/09/2018 NOC019
16/05/2018 NOC017
15/06/2017 NOC015
3/05/2017 NOC014
24/02/2016 NOC012
23/10/2015 NOC011

Charity Documents