pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


NEW ZEALAND BIO-RECORDING NETWORK TRUST
CC49036
9429043222827
Registered

Registration details

20/06/2012
March 31

Address for service

45 Landsdowne Terrace
Cashmere
Christchurch
8022

Charity's other details

0274400727
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/nzbrn/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/inaturalistnz?lang=en


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To increase knowledge, understanding, and appreciation of New Zealand’s natural history by engaging and assisting New Zealanders in observing and recording biological information.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(General public education of New Zealand's biodiversity heritage), Sponsors / undertakes research

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

The Purposes of the Trust are: To increase knowledge, understanding, and appreciation of New Zealand’s natural history. To engage and assist New Zealanders in observing and recording biological information. To develop and support electronic and other information infrastructure to assist individuals and groups to record, view, share and utilise biological records as an educational resource. To advance the purposes of the Trust through partnerships with a range of collaborators and com

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 13/09/2023 $5,155 $760
30/09/2022 27/09/2022 $5,211 $590
30/09/2021 8/09/2021 $6,321 $100
30/09/2020 27/08/2020 $1,364 $15,078
30/09/2019 10/09/2019 $21,217 $15,833
30/09/2018 17/09/2018 $7,085 $30,053
30/09/2017 3/07/2017 $18,387 $1,018
30/09/2016 18/10/2016 $5,063 $6,149
30/09/2015 16/08/2015 $42,961 $6,722
30/09/2014 21/10/2014 $32,418 $39,601

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Murray Ian Dawson Trustee 27/08/2020
Stephen Pawson Treasurer 7/06/2011
Colin Douglas Meurk Chairperson 30/05/2011
Jeremy Adrian Cooper Trustee 30/05/2011
Jon James Sullivan Secretary 30/05/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Shane Edward Orchard Trustee 20/06/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/08/2021 NOC008
20/06/2018 NOC004
19/08/2013 AR001

Charity Documents