pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Awa Kairangi Access Trust
TAKA Trust
CC52630
9429043273409
Registered

Registration details

18/08/2015
December 31

Address for service

29 Oban Street
Wadestown
Wellington
6012

Charity's other details

0272159086


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide services and support that will improve the lives of the North East Hutt Valley youth, whanau and communities - where their potential is realised and they are taking every opportunity to be successful in our society. To provide a strategic, connected and inclusive approach to our services ensuring our partners are effectively engaged throughout our school and whanau communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Community development

Education / training / research, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

- The activities of the Trust will be limited to Aotearoa/New Zealand - The Board will comprise of no less than three Trustees - The Trustees will elect from themselves a chairman - The Trust is reliant on receiving donations and grants in order to provide services which meet the Charitable objectives of the Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 17/01/2023 $153,429 $137,211
30/06/2022 31/01/2022 $143,151 $164,401
30/06/2021 19/03/2021 $211,804 $181,721
30/06/2020 8/06/2020 $104,146 $185,580
30/06/2019 1/04/2019 $229,980 $137,171
30/06/2018 5/02/2018 $24,230 $4,413
30/06/2017 25/04/2017 $7,400 $13,000
30/06/2016 31/05/2016 $8,000 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dave Lamont Trustee 20/06/2023
Ian Perry Trustee 23/05/2023
Naomi Shaw Trustee 1/01/2023
Mike Mercer Trustee 14/02/2020
Rebecca Laracy Trustee 24/04/2017
Steven Swallow Trustee 24/04/2017
Edward Louden Executive Officer 10/06/2015
Matt Reid Chairperson 10/06/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ken Laban Trustee 30/06/2022
Ian Hastie Trustee 1/01/2022
Carolyn Stuart Trustee 30/10/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/06/2023 NOC010
21/06/2023 NOC009
11/03/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents