pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Destiny Church Rotorua
CC29108
9429043078493
Deregistered
07/02/2012
This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by sections 41 and 42 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Destiny Church Rotorua at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 7/02/2012 This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by sections 41 and 42 of the Charities Act.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 1463
Rotorua
3040
Cnr Pukaki & Tutanekai Streets
Rotorua
3040

Charity's other details

07 3480904
07 3486877


Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2011 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/08/2010 31/01/2011 $577,434 $570,985
31/08/2009 10/05/2010 $785,159 $807,755

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ana Miriam Draper Pastor 20/09/2001
Jean Pearl Hunt Trustee 20/09/2001
Michael Selwyn Draper Senior Pastor 20/09/2001
Peter Roy Hunt Trustee 20/09/2001

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents