Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Waingākau Housing Development
CC58007
9429047143579
Registered

Registration details

15/05/2020
June 30

Address for service

821 Orchard Road
Camberley
Hastings
4120

Charity's other details

021 475 807
06 871 5351


Group Members


Below are all the members of . Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Te Taiwhenua O Heretaunga Trust
Waingākau Housing Development

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Company has been established to support the charitable purposes of the Te Taiwhenua O Heretaunga Trust as set out in the Trust Deed. To do this, the Company's specific charitable purposes are: (a) To relieve poverty by developing pathways to affordable housing options through the provision of social rental housing to full home ownership; and (b) To benefit the wider community by providing a housing village for whanau with a range of affordable housing options and incidental facilities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Community development

General public

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

100% subsidiary of Te Taiwhenua O Heretaunga Trust (charity registration number CC20582)
Te Taiwhenua O Heretaunga Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 30 June 2020 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 26/01/2024 $57,966,651 $49,833,615 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 21/11/2022 $51,594,437 $42,866,869 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 13/01/2022 $37,096,043 $31,515,482 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kane Nicholas Koko Director 25/02/2022
Waylyn June Tahuri-Whaipakanga Director 13/01/2022
George Reedy Director 19/11/2018
Michael Anthony Paku Director 19/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christine Hana Hilton Director 1/05/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/08/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.