pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
CC42024
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 76900
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
47 Ben Lomond Crescent
Pakuranga Heights
Auckland
2010

Charity's other details

09 262 5620
09 262 5621


Group Members


Below are all the members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Adventist Development and Relief Agency
Bethesda Care Limited
Bethesda Village Limited
LHF Limited
New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Health Association Limited
New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Religious Organisation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Part of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church in New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ben Timothy President 5/09/2010
Shane Palipane Chief Financial Officer 5/09/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Edward Tupai Chairperson 27/07/2018
Brenda Smith Exectutive Committee Member 17/10/2016
David Melville Executive committee member 17/10/2016
Emma Weslake Executive Committee Member 17/10/2016
Helen Carter Executive Committee Member 17/10/2016
Jean-Pierre Theron Executive Committee Member 17/10/2016
Norman King Executive committee member 17/10/2016
Paora Kotia Teaukura Committee Member 17/10/2016
Sue Ah-young Executive Committee Member 17/10/2016
Tagaloa Enoka Puni Executive committee member 17/10/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/10/2018 NOC009
12/12/2016 NOC005
28/02/2013 NOC004
29/01/2013 NOC003
8/03/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC42023) on 12 December 2016.