pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Whanganui Māori Reservation Trust
Whanganui Bay Māori Reservation Trust
CC56475
N/A
Registered

Registration details

13/11/2018
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Whanganui Bay Maori Reservation Trust 13/11/2018
Whanganui Māori Reservation Trust 27/08/2020

Address for service

PO Box 178
Taumarunui
3946

Charity's other details

+64223134312
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/groups/824396062065887/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust’s objectives are to administer, protect and preserve the reservation of Whanganui Bay, and to apply any income received in relation to the Trust for the Māori cultural, social, and economic wellbeing of the beneficiaries of Whanganui Bay.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Marae on reservation land

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage

Other (please state)

(Descendants of Ngati Te Maunga Hapu o Ngati Tuwharetoa iwi.)

Entity Structure

Māori Reservation Trust under Te Ture Whenua Maori Act. There are currently 9 trustees who constitute the governance board. The Trust relies on volunteer trustees and others to govern and operate.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 1/08/2022 $18,768 $10,032
30/09/2021 22/07/2021 $16,144 $21,534
30/09/2020 15/09/2020 $13,986 $20,116
30/09/2019 28/11/2019 $16,491 $30,169

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joanne TeHuia Co-Chair/Governance/Finance 16/03/2020
Jovita Whenuakura Floyd Treasurer/Economic Development 16/03/2020
Manu McLeod Environment/Social Development 16/03/2020
Pauline Casey Thompson Finance/Social Development 16/03/2020
Regina Iriaka Hepi Economic/Social Development 16/03/2020
Warwick Hepi Co-Chair/Environment/Social Development 16/03/2020
Marlon Te Hinarakau Hepi Economic Development 1/07/2017
Veronica Josephine Pirihira Hunapo Social Development/Finance 2/07/2016
Rosette Moerangi Rakaupai Governance/Social Development 1/07/2004

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Huitao Te Kohika Rakaupai Treasurer/Environment 23/02/2022
Mereana Maryanne Hepi Resigned 2019 6/05/2020
Blandina Te Wikitoria Diamond Resigned 2019 12/08/2019
Mandie Brown Resigned 2019 10/11/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/07/2023 NOC017
16/07/2023 NOC016
3/08/2022 NOC015
3/08/2022 NOC014
15/05/2021 NOC011
15/05/2021 NOC010
19/03/2021 NOC009
9/03/2021 NOC008
9/03/2021 NOC007
28/09/2020 NOC006

Charity Documents