pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Greater Wellington Backcountry Network Incorporated
GWBN
CC10539
9429043032136
Registered

Registration details

2/07/2007
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Tararua Aorangi Rimutaka Huts Committee Incorporated 3/07/2007
Greater Wellington Backcountry Network Incorporated 5/07/2022

Address for service

220 South Road
RD 5
Solway
Masterton
5885

Charity's other details

027 635 8994
Facebook icon image
GWBN


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To foster backcountry recreational activities within the Tararua, Aorangi and Remutaka forest parks through supporting the management of the network of backcountry huts and tracks used by the public for recreation. Activities include building and maintaining huts, tracks and vehicle access. Also encourage backcountry recreation through promoting recreation opportunities and advocating for safe and appropriate recreation in the forest parks.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Sport / recreation

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

The Network is operated by a Committee. It has membership that includes individual and clubs with and interest in providing and maintaining the huts and tracks for use by the public in the three Forest Parks. The GWBN has agreements with the Department of Conservation to maintain specific huts and tracks. The society is generally funded by the Department of Conservation. Funding is also sought from other charitable trusts.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 14/07/2023 $14,400 $34,881
30/09/2022 22/04/2022 $23,300 $17,652
30/09/2021 30/08/2021 $0 $0
30/09/2020 3/04/2020 $0 $1,900
30/09/2019 1/11/2019 $9,000 $2,517
30/09/2018 1/11/2019 $0 $4,598
30/09/2017 7/11/2019 $9,050 $5,133
30/09/2016 29/11/2016 $0 $0
30/09/2015 22/03/2016 $676 $3,835
30/09/2014 10/02/2015 $10,170 $20,721

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Owen Cox Treasurer 12/07/2022
Derrick Field Chairman 9/03/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Edward John Trotter Treasurer 1/10/2022
Derrick Ormand Field Treasurer 12/07/2022
Nicholas Boyack Chairman 29/09/2020
Phil Glasson Treasurer 29/09/2020
Hugh Barr Secretary/Treasurer 14/10/2019
Jean Heather Garman Chairperson 11/03/2013
Ian Gordon Wilson Treasurer 5/03/2012
Claudia Hill Secretary 22/04/2010
Emma Greig Secretary 9/03/2009
Ronald John Christopher Pynenburg Chairman 10/09/2007

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/07/2023 NOC030
15/10/2022 NOC029
15/10/2022 NOC028
6/07/2022 NOC027
5/07/2022 NOC024
5/07/2022 NOC023
7/04/2021 NOC019
7/04/2021 NOC018
6/04/2021 NOC017
24/10/2019 NOC012

Charity Documents