Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Cambridge Community House Trust
Cambridge Community Agencies Network Trust
CC45448
9429042601821
Registered

Registration details

28/09/2010
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Cambridge Community Agencies Network Trust 29/09/2010
Cambridge Community House Trust 30/11/2015

Address for service

PO Box 633
Cambridge
3450
193 Shakespeare Street
Leamington
Cambridge
3432

Charity's other details

07 827 5402
https://www.facebook.com/CambridgeCommunityHouse


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Supporting the people of Cambridge to make positive changes in their own lives by providing support, education and resources.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 29/02/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 3/11/2022 $1,286,847 $835,422 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 18/11/2021 $855,081 $580,796 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 12/11/2020 $617,959 $489,322 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 6/11/2019 $442,648 $476,791 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 28/02/2019 30/01/2019 $439,657 $451,298 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 20/12/2017 $424,919 $424,784 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 13/12/2016 $367,544 $380,734 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 21/01/2016 $410,801 $383,528 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 11/11/2015 $292,092 $364,384 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Valerie Hazelden Trustee 28/11/2023
Mike Steele Treasurer 5/10/2023
Te Hirii Taute Trustee 12/09/2023
Chad Danswan Trustee 13/06/2023
Fiona Mary Adam Trustee 9/08/2022
Sara Gabrielle Byrne General Manager 29/03/2022
Diana Grantham Trustee 1/04/2020
Stuart Matthews Trustee 1/04/2020
Carolyn Casey Chairperson 1/07/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Coralee Carr Trustee 12/09/2023
Robyn Anne Parker Trustee 13/06/2023
Cliff Comins Trustee 21/02/2023
Jeffery Nobes Treasurer 1/11/2022
Karla Welsh Trustee 18/11/2021
Penelope Ann Pickett Trustee 9/04/2021
Julie Feisst-Jones Health & Safety Trustee 10/03/2020
Shirley Stephens Deputy Chairperson 30/09/2019
Don Harris Trustee 1/08/2019
John Payne Trustee 1/03/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/12/2023 NOC022
5/10/2023 NOC021
5/10/2023 NOC020
18/11/2021 NOC017
13/12/2018 NOC013
18/02/2016 NOC008
7/12/2015 NOC007
24/02/2015 NOC006
24/02/2015 NOC005
15/01/2014 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.