Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Food Waste Champions 12.3 Trust
NZFWC12.3
CC60845
9429050867370
Registered

Registration details

7/11/2022
June 30

Address for service

5 Aranoni Track
Clifton
Christchurch
8081

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Progressing Aotearoa New Zealand's response to UN Sustainable Development Goal 12.3 to halve food waste by 2030. This encompasses reducing the impact of climate change and increasing community resilience and food security. We do this by: - educating on practical ways to reduce food waste - advocating for policy level change - providing resources and guides which facilitate action - empower individuals, businesses, government and organisations to prevent and reduce food waste

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/03/2024 28/03/2024 $275,314 $215,206 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul Harvey Trustee 20/05/2024
Rebecca LLoyd Trustee 20/05/2024
Victoria Hatton Trustee 20/05/2024
Sam Oakden Trustee 27/07/2023
Andrew Fisher Trustee 28/10/2022
Deborah Manning Trustee 28/10/2022
Miranda Jayne Mirosa Trustee, Chair of the board 12/10/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sarah Pritchett Trustee 20/05/2024

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/04/2024 NOC003
12/12/2022 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.