pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland Zen Centre
CC20537
9429043162727
Registered

Registration details

16/01/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 109729
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
52 Princes Street
Onehunga
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

(09) 550 4383
Facebook icon image
Auckland Zen Centre


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Auckland Zen Centre fosters the teaching of Zen Buddhism by providing authentic training in its disciplines, practices and devotions. We are a community of practitioners united by commitment to the cultivation of wisdom and compassion.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Teaching

Religious activities

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Participants - i.e. people who practice what we teach

Entity Structure

The Auckland Zen Centre is governed by a Board of 5 Trustees, made up of a Chairperson, Secretary, Treasurer and 2 Trustees. A Spiritual Director overseas the religious affairs of the Centre and works with the Board and a Manager conducts the day to day operations of the Centre.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 16/09/2020 $141,867 $140,277
30/09/2019 12/03/2020 $137,732 $121,427
31/10/2018 10/10/2018 $131,454 $103,489
30/09/2017 18/09/2017 $124,413 $86,795
30/09/2016 26/09/2016 $104,814 $81,443
30/09/2015 16/09/2015 $165,613 $77,561
30/09/2014 28/09/2014 $163,640 $66,701
30/09/2013 18/09/2013 $54,500 $48,079
30/09/2012 20/09/2012 $61,141 $47,144
30/09/2011 23/09/2011 $61,415 $47,212

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Celestyna Galicki Trustee 11/03/2020
Peter Christensen Treasurer 30/08/2017
Adrian Edward Croucher Secretary 8/05/2011
Grant Raymond George Trustee 28/02/2008
Richard Paul Leigh Von Sturmer Chair 17/01/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Katherine Jane Paulin Secretary 4/12/2019
Wayne Frecklington Chair 30/08/2017
Robin Elizabeth Gee Trustee 17/02/2016
Sally Mcara Trustee 15/07/2015
Peter Angelo Carafice Trustee 1/07/2010
Ann Duncan Trustee 7/02/2010
Teresa Behrens Chairperson 7/02/2010
Alwyn Bruce Christian Trustee 28/02/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/05/2020 NOC018
22/08/2019 NOC016
14/06/2018 NOC014
2/09/2017 NOC012
2/09/2017 NOC011
17/03/2016 NOC009
27/11/2015 NOC008
10/10/2014 NOC007
29/06/2011 NOC004
26/09/2010 AR003

Charity Documents