pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Johnsonville Property Trust Limited
CC22302
9429038553066
Registered

Registration details

30/03/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 13072
Johnsonville
Wellington
6440
15 Kaiwharawhara Road
Kaiwharawhara
Wellington
6035

Charity's other details

(04)4785799


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Maintain and generate income to ensure the payment of consistent dividends to their sole shareholder

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Community development

Other charities

Entity Structure

Board consisting of Four members
Johnsonville Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 6/09/2023 $989,499 $770,343
30/09/2022 26/09/2022 $2,661,398 $594,560
30/09/2021 1/09/2021 $934,477 $733,606
30/09/2020 31/08/2020 $932,873 $686,571
30/09/2019 26/08/2019 $894,267 $657,246
30/09/2018 17/09/2018 $873,847 $635,634
30/09/2017 5/09/2017 $687,457 $483,349
30/09/2016 20/09/2016 $711,771 $544,602
30/09/2015 24/08/2015 $654,292 $489,909
30/09/2014 1/09/2014 $679,757 $563,209

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Christine Kaye Davies Director 1/01/2020
Tracy Ann Hurst-Porter DIRECTOR 29/05/2018
James Candiliotis Director 10/09/2014
David John Evans Director 31/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Raymond John Good Director 1/04/2022
Justin Mark Lester Director 12/08/2019
Deborah Lee Avison Director 19/02/2016
Michael Graham Collett Director 31/08/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/04/2022 NOC019
24/03/2020 NOC015
26/08/2019 NOC013
17/09/2018 NOC012
4/04/2016 NOC008
16/09/2014 NOC007
16/09/2014 NOC006
1/09/2014 NOC005
20/01/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents