pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Bible League International New Zealand
Bible League New Zealand
CC48547
9429043317653
Registered

Registration details

3/12/2012
September 30

Address for service

Unit 12
65 Paul Matthews Road
Rosedale
Auckland
0632

Charity's other details

94419448
Facebook icon image
BibleLeagueANZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Serving the under-resourced Church globally through the provision of Bibles, biblical resources and training to transform lives worldwide and help people meet Jesus.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Fund-raising, Christian ministries

General public

Other charities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Deed of Charitable Trust - Executed 23rd August 2012

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2022 18/02/2022 $676,326 $676,014
31/03/2021 29/03/2021 $676,008 $667,592
31/03/2020 12/03/2020 $701,137 $716,759
31/03/2019 14/08/2019 $727,718 $731,597
31/03/2018 20/02/2019 Restricted Restricted Restricted Restricted
31/03/2017 19/10/2017 $531,060 $541,694
31/03/2016 9/02/2016 $624,361 $626,415
31/03/2015 5/01/2015 $600,614 $562,260
28/02/2014 17/01/2014 $666,452 $669,042

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amri Theron Trustee 27/11/2021
Daleen Jordaan Trustee 27/11/2021
Leonard David Pauling Trustee 27/11/2021
Jacob Ploeg Trustee 6/07/2019
Johannes Norel Trustee 6/07/2019
Adam Reitsma Trustee 24/11/2017
Raymond James Condon Trustee 5/01/2017
Arie Baalbergen Trustee 23/08/2012
Jarrod Vaughan Thompson Trustee 23/08/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dirk Reitsma Trustee 27/11/2021
Donald Frederic H De Vries Trustee 18/02/2021
Peter John Calvin knight Trustee 27/11/2020
Blayne Herr Trustee 31/08/2019
Gregory Charles Taylor Trustee 30/09/2016
Malcolm Ross Armstrong Trustee 30/09/2015
Marion Wittrien Trustee 30/09/2014
Stephen Rockwell Trustee 30/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/02/2022 NOC011
13/02/2018 NOC006
18/04/2016 NOC003
9/09/2015 NOC002
26/06/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents