Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Devonport Peninsula Trust
Te Hau Kapua Devonport Peninsula Trust
CC45350
9429043191048
Registered

Registration details

15/09/2010
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 32537
Devonport
Auckland
0744

Charity's other details

n/a
n/a
https://www.facebook.com/DevonportPeninsulaTrust/
https://twitter.com/DevnportPnTrust
Neighbourly, Instagram


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Devonport Peninsula Trust's vision is for 'a welcoming community - in which our people are engaged with each other, and the environment in which they live. It's mission is to build community by enabling and empowering local communities and groups, through facilitation, support, and networking. It's goals are to strenthen provision for and recognition of Te Ao Māori in its work across the Peninsula; to oroganise whole of peninsula events and support groups to organise local or group based events, in order to promote a sense of belonging and wellbeing and celebrate the (unique and vibrant) culture that defines Peninsula communities, provide its own and and support other’s networks in order to build relationships, enhance well-being, and reduce isolation; to strengthen the Trust's communcations with the community; Promote a sense of shared belonging and guardian ship of our environment and its sustainable use; and to provide good governance and a credible organization through sustainable

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Providing community development services: community events & projects, networking opportunities, support community initiatives, conveying local needs/sharing info, promotion of community safety.)

Community development

Emergency / disaster relief, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 29/02/2024 27/02/2024 $404,662 $405,068 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/03/2023 15/03/2023 $342,105 $364,263 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 20/12/2021 $244,038 $242,758 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 9/11/2020 $262,746 $232,741 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 8/07/2019 $177,947 $185,140 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 26/11/2018 $166,138 $162,658 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 6/11/2017 $145,624 $140,273 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 26/09/2016 $109,674 $102,549 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 21/10/2015 $88,571 $99,187 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 31/08/2014 $86,211 $88,288 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Willem Jan Mazenier Trustee 24/04/2023
Beth Beard Trustee 30/03/2023
Gordon Brodie Trustee 18/11/2021
Iain Robert Rea Chairperson/Trustee 19/03/2020
Brent Peter Talbot Treasurer/Trustee 13/12/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ian Graham Cunliffe Trustee 1/05/2024
Anne McMillan Trustee 29/09/2023
Philipp Gregor Jaser Trustee 20/04/2023
Gay Richards Trustee 18/05/2022
Bernadette Mary Ranford Trustee 20/05/2021
David Veart Chairperson/Trustee 16/12/2020
Teresa Robyn Smeed Trustee 18/06/2020
Alastair Fletcher Trustee 19/03/2020
Lynn Phillip Lawton Trustee 19/02/2019
Rebecca McMillan Treasurer 10/12/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/05/2024 NOC034
13/10/2023 NOC032
10/07/2023 NOC031
29/04/2023 NOC030
25/05/2022 NOC028
16/02/2022 NOC027
8/09/2021 NOC025
25/05/2021 NOC024
16/12/2020 NOC023
28/08/2020 NOC021
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.