pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Vogelmorn Community Group Charitable Trust
CC55778
9429043271092
Registered

Registration details

11/10/2018
June 30

Address for service

93 Mornington Road
Brooklyn
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/vogelmornnz
http://www.instagram.com/vogelmorn


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to provide facilities for, and encourage; arts, cultural, sporting, health, social, educational, and recreational activities within Vogeltown, Mornington and surrounding areas, for the benefit of the community; and to ensure public commons, including grass commons, buildings and other shared spaces are secured, used and enhanced for this purpose.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Cares for buildings and open space alongside a programme of activities and events to enrich the local community.)

Community development

General public

Entity Structure

The VCG Board of Trustees is made up of nine Trustees including three executive positions: chairperson, treasurer and secretary. The board may co-opt other persons to further the purpose of the Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 22/12/2022 $199,909 $204,794
31/12/2021 27/01/2022 $167,309 $169,011
31/12/2020 24/11/2020 $105,621 $93,127
29/02/2020 27/02/2020 $45,257 $38,535

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Matthew Landreth Trustee 22/12/2022
Thomas Lahood Trustee 10/10/2019
Sam Donald Trustee 26/03/2019
David Bagnall Trustee 22/03/2018
Natalie Crane Treasurer 6/03/2018
Philip Clatworthy Chairperson 6/03/2018
Ruth Fischer-Smith Trustee 6/03/2018
Sophia Jerram Trustee 6/03/2018
Jeremy Macey Secretary 7/09/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Simon McClellan Treasurer 10/03/2020
Joanna Randerson Trustee 12/08/2019
Omri Ash Trustee 23/11/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/03/2020 NOC004
18/02/2020 NOC002
25/07/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents