pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Destiny Church Christchurch
CC31639
9429043120321
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

PO Box 454
Rangiora
7440
108 Petries Road
Woodend 7610
Northwood
Woodend
7610

Charity's other details

02102337997
Facebook icon image
Destiny Church Christchurch


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide religious services, activities and programmes in the Canterbury region. Offering holistic Church Services, pastoral care/support, information, guidance, budgeting, mentoring and other services as required. To enlighten, encourage and strengthen individuals, families and their wider communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Destiny Church Christchurch Trust has five trustees. Two of these trustees are employed full-time to lead the entity, train and mentor volunteers & to be evangelistic in the community. They also undertake administrative tasks and provide pastoral care, programme delivery, mentoring and budgeting services.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2022 31/08/2022 $227,420 $183,104
31/08/2021 13/03/2022 $209,977 $172,077
31/10/2020 27/02/2022 $163,634 $163,508
31/08/2019 30/08/2019 $150,225 $152,516
31/08/2018 29/08/2018 $132,397 $149,189
31/08/2017 30/08/2017 $194,027 $183,192
31/08/2016 27/08/2016 $204,611 $160,247
31/08/2015 27/08/2015 $179,490 $148,595
31/08/2014 2/10/2014 $158,360 $150,321
31/08/2013 31/08/2013 $173,152 $173,625

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eden Lee O'Connor Trustee 1/04/2019
Aroha Tracee Garth Trustee 5/09/2016
Regan Newman Davis-Willie Trustee 5/09/2016
Derek Hohepa Tait Trustee 30/06/2008
Marina Edna Tait Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Trustee 1/04/2019
Lautaimi Nicky Sofai Trustee 20/02/2017
Anita Mary Breach Trustee 17/08/2016
Grant Breach Trustee 17/08/2016
Jean Pearl Hunt Trustee 26/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/02/2022 NOC013
14/02/2022 NOC012
22/05/2019 NOC010
27/08/2016 NOC007
27/08/2016 NOC006
31/08/2013 AR006
30/08/2012 AR005

Charity Documents