pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Colville Project Trust
TCPT
CC56058
9429047031746
Registered

Registration details

11/10/2018
June 30

Address for service

2299 Colville Road
RD 4
Colville
Coromandel
3584
c/o Colville PDC
RD 4
Colville
Coromandel
3584

Charity's other details

07 866 6618
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/thecolvilleproject


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Mission Ensure the ongoing wellbeing of the Northern Coromandel Peninsula community to support a strong circular economy. Our Vision The Northern Coromandel Peninsula is a thriving place to live, work and play across your lifespan. Our Values Innovation and responsiveness: We embrace open-minded solutions and engage with new opportunities. Sustainable Environments: We have positive and enduring social, economic and ecological impact. Community Focused: We build authentic relationships with our local and wider communities. Integrity: Our actions are ethical, transparent, and align with Te Tiriti o Waitangi.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

General public

Colville community

Entity Structure

Under the trust deed, the Trust shall be accountable to the communities of the northern Coromandel peninsula The Trust is governed by no less than 3 and no more than 7 trustees or up to 9 where either intial partner has 3 trustees New trustees will be selected from stakeholder groups, including the community. Officers of the trust are selected from the trustees, in the case of Chairperson, and from either the trustees or the community, in the case of Secretary and Treasurer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 21/09/2022 $697,106 $15,920
31/12/2021 4/01/2022 $77,877 $1,387
31/12/2020 14/12/2020 $15,478 $1,588
31/12/2019 4/04/2020 $224,534 $1,593

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Janet PALMER Trustee 22/09/2022
Nicole Brighouse Trustee 22/09/2022
Emily Kate Armstrong-Campbell Trustee 22/08/2018
Kirstine Jo Herbert Trustee 22/08/2018
Bronwyn Blair Trustee 12/12/2017
Frederick Church Trustee 12/12/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/09/2022 NOC009
10/02/2022 NOC007
9/12/2021 NOC005
14/05/2021 NOC004
5/03/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents