Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Institute in Basic Life Principles
IBLP
CC30138
9429042620587
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

104 Ashton Fitchett Drive
Brooklyn
Wellington
6021
7 Kensington Road
Marton 4710
Marton
4710

Charity's other details

+64 27 27 42 631


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support families in providing education for their children in all areas of life

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides education

Education / training / research

Accommodation / housing, Social services, Religious activities, International activities, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Community Service

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 7/05/2025 $103,124 $74,306 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 17/04/2024 $101,679 $123,076 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 8/03/2023 $45,391 $42,143 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 28/02/2022 $104,255 $71,101 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 5/02/2021 $56,865 $67,148 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 2/03/2020 $65,740 $67,239 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 2/04/2019 $65,784 $90,059 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 7/05/2018 $51,316 $67,202 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/08/2017 $81,073 $74,683 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 27/07/2016 $-249,714 $168,502 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Evan Tyler Trustee & Vice Chairman 27/04/2025
Ben Ziesemer Treasurer 21/04/2025
John Bechtle Trustee 21/04/2025
Gil Bates Trustee, Chairman & Vice-President 31/08/2017
Robert Barth Secretary 31/08/2017
Timothy Levendusky Trustee & President 31/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David York Board member 11330 W. Whitaker Ave Greenfield WI 53228 USA 21/04/2025
Dwight Fredrickson Treasurer 280 Laurel Lane Big Sandy TX 75755 USA 21/04/2025
Stephen Paine Vise-President 8706 West Eseco Road Agra OK 74824 USA 1/03/2022
Roy Blackwood Trustee 31/08/2017
Samuel Johnson Trustee 31/08/2017
William Boyd Trustee 31/08/2017
William Gothard Trustee 31/08/2017
Billy Boring Jr Trustee 31/12/2016
Ralph Hudgens Trustee 31/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/10/2024 NOC016
23/02/2023 NOC013
31/07/2017 NOC006
16/05/2013 AR006
23/06/2011 AR004
25/11/2010 AR003
8/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.