pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Kohanga Reo National Trust Board
CC11324
9429042863502
Registered

Registration details

10/10/2007
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 38741
Wellington Mail Centre
Lower Hutt
5045
67 Hankey Street
Mount Cook
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)3818750
(04)3818777


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To strengthen the kohanga reo movement, including reo language revitalization, learning and whanau development.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

Arts / culture / heritage

Family / whanau

Children / young people

Entity Structure

A Charitable Trust with 1 wholly owned subsidiary.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Te Pataka Ohanga Limited CC20442

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2020 20/07/2020 $12,211,000 $11,580,000
30/06/2019 21/05/2019 $9,990,000 $10,510,000
30/06/2018 18/06/2018 $10,532,000 $9,765,000
30/06/2017 29/05/2017 $10,191,000 $8,951,000
30/06/2016 13/06/2016 $9,368,000 $8,765,000
30/06/2015 15/06/2015 $8,676,000 $10,499,000
30/06/2014 26/06/2014 $9,451,000 $10,538,000
30/06/2013 23/04/2013 $9,765,000 $10,458,000
30/06/2012 18/05/2012 $10,147,000 $10,762,000
30/06/2011 27/05/2011 $11,552,000 $10,641,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hoana McMillian Trustee 27/04/2021
Peggy Wahataua Luke-Ngaheke Trustee 27/04/2021
Hurimoana Dennis Trustee 26/06/2017
Matuakore Hook Trustee 26/06/2017
Susan Lillian Tipene Trustee 26/06/2017
Tariana Turia Trustee 26/06/2017
Tewheoro Rangikotua Trustee 26/06/2017
Waihoroi Paraone Hoterene Trustee 21/09/2016
Daniel Hori Pehikuru Kororiki Procter Trustee 29/10/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Drusilla Kapu Barrett Trustee 12/12/2017
Timoti Samual Karetu Trustee 12/12/2017
Tina Olsen-Ratana Trustee 12/12/2017
Iritana Te Rangi Tawhiwhirangi Trustee 27/06/2017
James Te Wharehuia Milroy Trustee 27/06/2017
Manuera Tohu Trustee 22/05/2016
Toni James Davis Waho Trustee 24/11/2014
Sir Graham Latimer Trustee 24/06/2014
Heke-Turoa Huata Trustee 31/12/2007

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/01/2021 NOC025
17/03/2020 NOC023
11/09/2019 NOC022
1/02/2018 NOC019
1/02/2018 NOC018
8/09/2017 NOC017
19/07/2017 NOC016
8/12/2016 NOC014
17/03/2016 NOC013
15/03/2016 NOC012

Charity Documents