pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Dilworth Trust Board
Dilworth School
CC32171
9429042645320
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
January 31

Address for service

Private Bag 28904
Remuera
Auckland
1541
2 Erin Street
Epsom
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 523 4882


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Dilworth Trust Board was established under the will of James Dilworth who died on 23 December 1894. Under the terms of the Will the Trustees are directed to maintain and educate boys from families of good character in "straitened circumstances" to enable them to become "good and useful members of society".

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Funds a school for disadvantaged boys.)

Education / training / research

Accommodation / housing, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Former Students

Entity Structure

The Dilworth Trust Board is a trust domiciled in New Zealand and registered under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957 and the Charities Act 2005.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
The Dilworth Foundation CC53690

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/07/2021 29/07/2021 $95,758,000 $36,992,000
30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $84,631,000 $35,533,000
31/07/2019 26/06/2019 $87,018,000 $29,756,000
31/07/2018 28/06/2018 $112,766,000 $33,029,000
31/07/2017 22/06/2017 $94,330,000 $28,587,000
31/07/2016 9/05/2016 $90,369,000 $27,841,000
31/07/2015 17/04/2015 $56,787,000 $23,307,000
31/07/2014 2/04/2014 $50,774,000 $22,644,000
31/07/2013 24/05/2013 $43,112,000 $23,963,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Leopino Sosefo Foliaki Trustee 28/02/2022
Jonathan Mason Trustee 1/03/2019
Peter John Alexander Trustee 27/03/2017
Simon Patrick McCrea Curran Trustee 30/03/2015
Aaron Peter Snodgrass Trustee 1/05/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Frances Deborah Valintine Trustee 28/02/2022
Brian Maltby Trustee 27/12/2021
Hugh Fletcher Trustee 31/07/2019
Jonathan Wain Trustee 28/04/2018
George Roger Wayne France Trustee 1/10/2016
Derek Sinclair Firth Trustee 23/02/2015
Peter David Hunter Trustee 30/04/2013
John Harry Watson Potter Trustee 30/06/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/03/2022 NOC025
9/02/2022 NOC024
14/01/2022 NOC023
15/10/2019 NOC019
5/09/2019 NOC018
30/04/2019 NOC016
29/04/2019 NOC015
6/06/2018 NOC013
27/06/2017 NOC012
7/02/2017 NOC010

Charity Documents