Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wakatipu Reforestation Trust
Whakatipu Reforestation Trust
CC50275
9429048602778
Registered

Registration details

21/02/2014
June 30

Address for service

181 Peninsula Road
Kawarau Falls
Queenstown
9300
181 Peninsula Road
P.O. Box 105
Kawarau Falls
Queenstown
9300

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/wrtqt.org.nz
https://www.instagram.com/wakatipureforestationtrust/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Maintain and operate a plant nursery to provide native and exotic plants for planting in the Wakatipu Basin. To preserve , reestablish and protect indigenous flora and fauna. Educate school children and the community about NZ native plants and how to grow them. Give our young people the knowledge and skills to face our unprecedented environmental challenges

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Community Projects

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Community Projects

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, Community

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 20/12/2023 $217,288 $156,776 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/01/2023 28/01/2023 $193,820 $156,144 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 6/08/2021 $146,935 $117,161 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 13/08/2020 $139,188 $107,514 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 27/08/2019 $142,306 $121,668 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 25/09/2018 $160,820 $66,844 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 14/09/2017 $72,234 $87,315 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 13/10/2016 $74,597 $73,321 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 9/10/2015 $77,745 $46,664 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 17/09/2014 $60,034 $23,182 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Katherine Elizabeth Durman Trustee 14/11/2023
Blair Jeffrey Devlin Trustee 13/05/2019
Benjamin Whittmore Teele Trustee 25/09/2018
Jillian Frances Hodgson Trustee 25/09/2018
Barbara Anne Simpson Trustee 21/02/2014
Neill Campbell Simpson Trustee 7/02/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Johnathon Mark Browne Trustee 26/02/2024
Jada Van Vliet Trustee 1/02/2021
John Robert Wilson Trustee 21/11/2018
Hans Johan Arne Arnestedt Trustee 25/09/2018
Jada Van Vlient Trustee 25/09/2018
Richard James Struthers Trustee 31/05/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/03/2024 NOC022
29/11/2023 NOC020
6/02/2023 NOC019
28/01/2023 NOC018
5/12/2022 NOC016
13/01/2022 NOC014
5/04/2021 NOC012
26/05/2019 NOC009
22/11/2018 NOC008
27/06/2016 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.