pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Blueprint NZ Limited
CC41145
9429033346700
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 307
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
293 Grey Street
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3216

Charity's other details

07 857 1200
07 157 1296


Group Members


Below are all the members of Wise Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Blueprint NZ Limited
Blueprint Trust Board
Ecopeople Limited
Linkage Limited
LinkPeople Limited
Mental Health Solutions Limited
Pacific Inc. Limited
Pathways Health Limited
Pathways Trust Board
Wise Trust Board

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides Education with a focus on a programmes that improve the mental helath workforce)

Health

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(People With Mental Illness)


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dean Rangihuna Director 25/09/2020
Josiah Tualamali'i Director 25/09/2020
Lyndy Jane Matthews Director 28/06/2019
Fran Silvestri Direcctor 25/09/2017
Richie Poulton Director 25/09/2017
Robert Steenhuisen Director 25/09/2017
Shelley Campbell Director 25/09/2017
Jacqueline Graham Director 24/06/2008
Julie Joy Nelson Director 16/07/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Francis Agnew Director 30/06/2019
Paul Ingle Director 7/08/2015
George Salmond Director 27/11/2013
Michael David Ward Director 13/08/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/11/2020 NOC011
9/10/2020 NOC010
7/08/2019 NOC009
25/07/2019 NOC008
4/10/2017 NOC007
28/09/2017 NOC006
10/08/2015 NOC005
19/12/2013 NOC004
19/08/2009 NOC003
10/08/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents