pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

4good Charitable Trust
4 Good
CC46762
9429043219841
Deregistered
11/03/2022
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of 4good Charitable Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

12/07/2011
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 11/03/2022 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 12/07/2011

Address for service

116 Third Avenue
Tauranga
3110

Charity's other details

0221228669
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/4good.org.nz/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

4good is an intermediary donation service. We allow donors (both individual and corporate) to easily give to New Zealand charities on a regular basis by setting up recurring monthly donations to 4good. In turn, each month, we distribute 100% of donations received to a non-profit organization or trust that benefits people in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

Other charities

Entity Structure

4good has a group of three to five Trustees, from which a Chairperson and Secretary are appointed. 4good does not have any staff of its own; operations are handled exclusively by volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2019 9/03/2020 $5,960 $5,420
30/09/2018 16/10/2018 $7,181 $7,047
30/09/2017 28/10/2017 $9,346 $9,041
30/09/2016 28/10/2016 $10,414 $10,603
30/09/2014 3/10/2014 $17,634 $16,270
30/09/2013 29/10/2013 $12,989 $12,558
30/09/2012 8/10/2012 $6,271 $5,585

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tony Snow Trustee / Chairperson 1/11/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Monique Anna-Marie Edlinger Trustee / Secretary 31/07/2019
Sheldon Leonardo Nesdale Trustee / Secretary / Treasurer 3/04/2018
Arnold Trustees 2011 Limited Trustee 22/03/2017
Alicia Maree Necklen Trustee 1/10/2016
Ryan Basil Kilfoil Trustee 1/10/2016
Michelle Ysabel Herrick Trustee 1/09/2016
Daniel Charles Necklen Trustee 9/08/2013
Rory Birkbeck Trustee 1/07/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/09/2019 NOC017
20/07/2018 NOC015
28/10/2017 NOC014
22/03/2017 NOC012
17/01/2017 NOC011
25/11/2016 NOC010
25/11/2016 NOC009
25/11/2016 NOC008
31/10/2016 NOC007
28/10/2016 NOC005

Charity Documents