pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ponsonby Baptist Church
CC47168
N/A
Registered

Registration details

11/12/2011
July 31

Address for service

43 Jervois Road
Ponsonby
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details

093763621


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To encourage its members to assemble regularly for the public worship of God. To inspire and maintain an active spiritual growth among its members. To proclaim the truths of the Bible. To promote a community of love among its members and goodwill to all.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Church members elect a Chairperson, Secretary and Treasurer who serve for one year and up to six Deacons who serve for two years. Our Minister is appointed by the church members for an indefinite period.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/01/2023 10/01/2023 $204,392 $303,698
31/01/2022 15/12/2021 $193,589 $220,571
28/02/2021 24/02/2021 $166,367 $188,512
31/01/2020 4/01/2020 $172,196 $166,459
31/01/2019 26/12/2018 $158,682 $190,793
31/01/2018 9/01/2018 $1,643,358 $173,989
31/01/2017 24/02/2017 $358,852 $173,386
31/01/2016 26/01/2016 $340,183 $148,071
31/01/2015 23/01/2015 $230,413 $152,456

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gary William Corbett Deacon 15/12/2021
Penelope Frances Cliffin Deacon 18/09/2019
Linda Louise Nicholls Treasurer 11/06/2019
Clarisse Niemand Chairperson 26/09/2018
Peter James Lineham Secretary 26/09/2018
Gavin Keith Jensen Deacon 14/09/2016
Jody Ruth Kilpatrick Minister 26/06/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jan Dewar Deacon 21/09/2022
Irene Andersen Chairperson 12/12/2021
Janice Claire Corbett Deacon 12/12/2021
Claire Rochelle Huggins Deacon 16/09/2020
Duane Trevor Coad Deacon 16/09/2020
Margaret McClure Secretary 18/09/2019
Vicki Nola Sqibbs Deacon 17/07/2019
Gary William Corbett Treasurer 26/05/2019
Geoff Henshaw Chairperson 26/09/2018
Rosemary Anne Jenkin Deacon 26/09/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/09/2020 NOC019
27/09/2019 NOC017
30/07/2019 NOC016
11/06/2019 NOC015
18/10/2018 NOC013
17/10/2018 NOC012
15/09/2017 NOC010
14/09/2017 NOC009
10/11/2016 NOC007
10/11/2016 NOC006

Charity Documents