pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wainuiomata Pioneer Church Preservation Society Incorporated
CC45763
9429043156719
Registered

Registration details

25/11/2010
March 31

Address for service

101 Wainuiomata Road
Wainuiomata
Lower Hutt
5014

Charity's other details

04 564 3051


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The aim of the Wainuiomata Pioneer Church Preservation Society Inc is to restore and preserve the 150 year old Church (Heritage Category II) located on the Coast Road Wainuiomata, for the use and enjoyment of future generations.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Restore and preserve a 150 year old Church)

Arts / culture / heritage

Community development

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The entity structure is a Heritage Church surrounded by a pioneer graveyard.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 9/08/2023 $26,744 $21,216
30/09/2022 7/09/2022 $20,907 $27,933
30/09/2021 28/09/2021 $17,781 $23,260
30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $20,467 $24,744
30/09/2019 3/09/2019 $149,875 $25,408
30/09/2018 31/01/2019 $46,755 $14,466
30/09/2017 26/09/2017 $18,819 $8,409
30/09/2016 18/08/2016 $99,981 $23,183
30/09/2015 11/09/2015 $24,831 $10,716
30/09/2014 16/09/2014 $28,058 $8,530

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anne Edith Tapp Treasurer 20/06/2021
Deborah Flanagan Committee member 1/09/2020
Linda Margaret Pegg Committee 21/06/2020
Linda Elizabeth Grime Committee Member 10/11/2014
Margaret Hannah Kinsey Chairperson 16/06/2013
Andrea Lister Committee member 10/06/2012
Joyce Lockyer Committee Member 13/02/2012
Vicky Alexander Secretary 13/02/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rochelle Stewart-Allen Committee Member 26/02/2023
Loren Ann Parker Committee Member 31/03/2022
Hellen Henriette Marcia Valster Graveyard Custodian 20/06/2021
Joy Asta Jones committee member 20/06/2021
Christine Daisy Parker Chair Person 11/05/2021
Annette Thomas Treasurer 10/06/2012
Colin Ronald Prouse Chairman 13/02/2012
Isla Mckinna Prouse Treasurer 13/02/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/08/2023 NOC015
26/02/2023 NOC012
21/06/2018 NOC006
26/06/2012 NOC003
16/02/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents