pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Taste Nature Social Enterprise Foundation
CC59242
N/A
Registered

Registration details

21/07/2021
March 31

Address for service

131 High Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
tastenaturenz
instagram


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our objective is to promote natural health, sustainability and address issues pertaining to climate change. Our charitable purpose is to achieve our objectives through providing services, projects, education and support to: • serve our community • provide affordable access to good health and organic food to all • teach our community how-to live-in harmony with nature • connect people to our environment • empower through education • reduce consumer waste into our environment

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

the board will be head of the organisation. the board will appoint sub committee's to manage and oversee projects as seen fit to deliver the social enterprises charitable goals and objectives. while we are a not for profit organisation, through the social enterprise we aim to raise funds through delivering services and projects to enable us to become self-sustainable and fund our own projects and education.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 6/07/2022 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Diana Hudson Board Member 27/06/2022
Justin Stent Treasurer/Financial Controller 30/03/2022
CLINTON chambers chairperson 1/04/2021
rodney Philip mcdonald deputy chair 1/04/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Colwill treasurer and secretary 30/03/2022
emma homerlein treasurer 8/11/2021
erin hoover sectretary 8/11/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/06/2022 NOC003
30/03/2022 NOC002
7/10/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents