Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

The Birdy Charitable Trust
CC49450
N/A
Deregistered
07/12/2016
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has wound up and transferred its assets to another entity for charitable purposes.

Below are details of The Birdy Charitable Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

11/08/2013
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 7/12/2016 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has wound up and transferred its assets to another entity for charitable purposes.
Registered 11/08/2013

Address for service

PO Box 1194
Shortland Street
Auckland
1140
C/O Asiaciti Trust New Zealand Limited
34 Shortland Street
Level 10
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Health, International activities, People with disabilities, Food and water

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, Women in need


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 7/06/2016 $166,042 $580,509 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 17/06/2015 $96,564 $684,785 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 20/08/2014 $126,999 $822,722 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alpage Trustee Limited Trustee 10/12/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/07/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.