pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Rehabilitation Association Incorporated
CC44021
9429042709015
Registered

Registration details

15/04/2010
March 31

Address for service

C/- William Levack, University of Otago Wellington
23 Mein Street
Newtown
Wellington
6242
C/- Professor William Levack, University of Otago Wellington
PO Box 7343
Newtown
Wellington
6242

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our key charitable activities are connecting, communicating and advocating for the rehabilitation community in New Zealand. These include a) To advance education, training and research of rehabilitation in New Zealand at a public, clinical and political level, b) To be beneficial to the community by providing opportunities to connect people involved in rehabilitation nationally and internationally, and c) To provide leadership and to advocate for excellence in rehabilitation in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides Website

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The organisation consists of members and an Executive. The Executive manages the ordinary business and affairs of the Association. a) The Executive consists of at least six members. b) There is a president, secretary and at least four other members, all to be elected at the Annual General Meeting. If an Executive position becomes vacant, the Executive shall have the power to co-opt a new Executive member.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2011.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 13/09/2022 $1,177 $5,101
30/09/2021 21/09/2021 $4,209 $11,605
30/09/2020 19/08/2020 $8,515 $11,396
30/09/2019 1/08/2019 $1,016 $2,362
30/09/2018 31/08/2018 $2,213 $13,471
30/09/2017 17/09/2017 $33,944 $11,700
30/09/2016 27/09/2016 $2,386 $2,274
30/09/2015 21/10/2015 $3,304 $13,182
30/09/2014 6/11/2014 $496 $6,539
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $4,575 $9,175

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jonathan Boyce Treasurer 2/04/2021
Felicity Bright Secretary 1/08/2019
Leanne Parker Executive Member 1/08/2019
Anne Heather Jones Executive Member 3/05/2019
William Levack President 3/05/2019
Rachelle Martin Executive member 14/10/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jo Nunnerley Executive member 30/09/2021
Nicola M Kayes Executive Member 30/09/2021
Debbie Snell Treasurer 2/04/2021
Peter Larmer Executive member 26/07/2019
Alan Maxwell Cavit Executive Member 3/05/2019
Kathryn Margaret Mc Pherson President 3/05/2019
William John Taylor Executive Member 3/05/2019
Duncan Babbage Committee member 31/08/2016
Jurriaan Adriaan De Groot Executive Member 14/10/2015
Michael Terrence Smith Executive Member 14/10/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/08/2019 NOC010
30/07/2019 NOC008
27/09/2016 NOC004
24/02/2016 NOC003
10/01/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents