pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The NZ Federation of Young Farmers Clubs Incorporated
NZ Young Farmers/ NZYF
CC37379
9429042785415
Registered

Registration details

2/02/2009
September 30

Address for service

PO Box 23141
Templeton
Christchurch
8445
185 Kirk Road
Templeton
Christchurch
7678

Charity's other details

03 303 3059


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To be the global provider of excellence- growing capability, connectivity and prestige within and between rural and urban communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Other (please state)

(Primary Industries)

Children / young people

General public, Rural Based Youth

Entity Structure

The organisation is managed by a board consisting of 4 elected Young Farmers, 3 strategic partners and the CEO. The CEO oversees a Leadership Team consisting of a Membership Manager, Special Projects Manager, Events & Contest Manager, Sponsorship Manager and Marketing & Communications Manager. The organisation has a wide array of local clubs, District Committees, Regional Committees and Contest Committee.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Donald Pearson Farms Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2022 10/02/2022 $2,321,538 $2,280,150
31/03/2021 17/01/2021 $2,135,787 $2,170,873
31/03/2020 30/03/2020 $3,174,174 $3,141,813
31/05/2019 22/05/2019 $8,478,120 $3,819,636
31/03/2018 8/04/2018 $3,732,723 $3,471,944
31/03/2017 4/09/2017 $3,603,581 $3,559,406
31/03/2016 31/08/2017 $3,658,000 $3,437,408
31/03/2015 21/02/2015 $1,021,891 $548,133
31/03/2014 28/03/2014 $2,138,030 $2,299,105
31/03/2013 10/04/2013 $878,857 $699,951

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Chloe Belfield Elected Board Member 9/07/2022
Nicola Blowey Elected Board Member 9/07/2022
Malcolm Nitschke Independent Director 16/09/2021
Samantha Kathleen Bills Elected Board Member 3/07/2021
Jessie Ann Waite Chair - Elected Board Member 4/07/2020
Catherine McMillan Independent Director 10/12/2019
Lynda Coppersmith CEO 3/10/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kent Mitchell Weir Chair - Elected Board Member 28/07/2022
Sharon Angus Independent Board member 28/07/2022
James Robertson Elected Board Member 30/04/2022
Ash-Leigh Elizabeth Campbell Chairperson - Elected Board Member 3/07/2021
Robert Tarn Marsden BARRY Elected Board Member 3/07/2021
Samuel Robinson Independent Board member 3/07/2021
Hannah Grace Camerson Elected Board Member 4/07/2020
Rebecca Eileen Brown Contest Representative 4/07/2020
Chelsea Millar Elected Board Member 6/07/2019
Jason Te Brake Board Member 6/07/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/08/2022 NOC019
26/07/2022 NOC018
16/09/2021 NOC016
14/09/2021 NOC015
5/03/2015 NOC008
23/01/2014 NOC007
4/04/2013 AR006
20/07/2012 AR005
4/04/2012 AR004
9/01/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents