pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Destiny Church Auckland Trust
CC29039
9429042958208
Deregistered
15/02/2022
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Destiny Church Auckland Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 15/02/2022 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 76433
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
25 Druces Road
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

095707150
095707149
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/DestinyChurchNZ/?ref=br_rs
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/DestinyChurchNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to build a large great spirit-filled church that is both redemptive and creative in all its expressions, impacting the city of Auckland, New Zealand and the world for Jesus Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Religious activities

Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Destiny Church Auckland Trust is a not-for-profit organisation governed by a board of trustees. The number of trustees may not be fewer than four. The day-to-day church ministry operations are managed by the church eldership. The financial operations have been delegated to a Finance Management Team that meet monthly to consider the trust's financial duties.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2019 7/11/2019 $2,879,998 $2,702,080
30/09/2018 1/10/2019 $2,053,437 $2,385,887
30/09/2017 27/09/2018 $2,077,145 $2,279,543
30/09/2016 29/09/2017 $4,648,730 $2,479,130
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $2,204,742 $2,591,645
30/09/2014 7/12/2014 $2,262,396 $2,538,414
30/09/2013 29/10/2014 $2,312,611 $2,929,691
31/08/2012 5/03/2013 $1,964,001 $2,404,911

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eden Lee O'Connor Trustee 1/04/2019
Jennifer Louise Marshall Trustee 22/09/2015
David Lawrence Hohepa Kahu Trustee 30/09/2014
Talamasene Leiasamaivao Trustee 25/06/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Chairman/Trustee 1/04/2019
Frances Anne Williamson Trustee 21/09/2015
Samuel Brian Francis Tamaki Trustee 30/09/2014
Richard Charles Lewis Trustee 17/09/2013
Tania Suzanne Pene Trustee 25/06/2013
Te Tuhi Manuera Renata Trustee 25/06/2013
Janine Eleanor Cardno Trustee 8/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/05/2019 NOC014
28/10/2015 NOC011
6/10/2014 NOC010
17/12/2013 NOC009
10/07/2013 NOC004
10/07/2013 NOC003
26/03/2013 NOC002
5/03/2013 AR005
31/08/2012 NOC001

Charity Documents