Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Destiny Church Taranaki
CC31434
9429042998730
Deregistered
15/02/2022
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Destiny Church Taranaki at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

6/30/2008
February 28

Address for service

13 Kipling Drive
Whalers Gate
New Plymouth
4310
13 Kipling Drive
Whalers Gate
New Plymouth
4310

Charity's other details

067581101
067581104


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust's mission is to promote and teach the word of God and the Gospel of Jesus.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Board of Trustees shall consist of not less than 4 members. Elected members of the Board include a Chairperson, Secretary and Treasurer. The Trust employs 1 person for the administration and running of the Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
2/28/2021 8/31/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
2/28/2020 10/31/2020 - - - To be filed To be filed
2/28/2019 8/31/2019 8/30/2019 $84,422 $76,159 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
2/28/2018 8/31/2018 9/27/2018 $109,111 $99,261 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
2/28/2017 8/31/2017 9/3/2018 $119,457 $124,500 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
2/28/2016 8/31/2016 8/29/2016 $140,297 $156,274 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
2/28/2015 8/31/2015 8/27/2015 $146,694 $135,968 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
2/28/2014 8/31/2014 10/3/2014 $182,690 $201,502 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
2/28/2013 8/31/2013 8/31/2013 $196,190 $216,901 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
2/29/2012 8/31/2012 8/31/2012 $221,350 $219,919 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eden Lee O'Connor Trustee 4/1/2019
Anne Kahu Trustee 4/17/2010
Jim Kopeke Trustee 4/17/2010
David Lawrence Hohepa Kahu Trustee 3/23/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Trustee 4/1/2019
Bryan Mclean Trustee 6/15/2014
Jean Pearl Hunt Trustee 6/26/2012
Martin Edward Finnigan Trustee 2/8/2011
Robyn Mary Edmonds Pastor 4/16/2010
Stanley Gavin Edmonds Senior Pastors 4/16/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/22/2019 NOC009
8/29/2016 NOC006
8/27/2015 NOC005
8/31/2012 AR005
1/31/2011 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.