Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Churches Education Commission Trust Board
Launchpad
CC22320
9429042616351
Registered

Registration details

30/03/2008
December 31

Address for service

CEC NATIONAL OFFICE PO Box 17178
Greenlane
Auckland
1546
Level 1
55 Hugo Johnston Drove
Penrose
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

095260052


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Empowering children to make positive life choices ,through values based Christian education. This is achieved through excellence in the classroom, strengthening relationships, engaging with a new generation of volunteers and delivering new and innovative training resources.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Social services, Religious activities

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

As a National entity, our core priorities are to assist each regional CEC office in NZ as they encourage, educate and equip presenters to add value to the local school community.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 20/06/2023 $900,221 $685,141 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 22/04/2022 $885,841 $806,668 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 13/05/2021 $809,016 $727,268 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 25/06/2020 $733,964 $743,104 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 31/07/2019 10/07/2019 $689,830 $731,249 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 31/07/2018 12/07/2018 $809,396 $721,295 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 12/07/2017 $565,958 $673,061 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 3/10/2016 $558,156 $491,236 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 2/06/2016 $593,263 $508,828 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 25/09/2014 $505,505 $497,594 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rush De Silva Trustee 24/02/2022
Julie McKinnon trustee 18/02/2021
Shona Pink-Martin Trustee 11/09/2019
Jacolize Becker Trustee 1/10/2016
Hamish Thomson Trustee 11/03/2015
Peter McDonald Chair 18/05/2013
Karen Warner Trustee 11/03/2013
Roderick Kinross Bent Trustee 10/06/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Murray Burton Trustee 9/11/2023
Nicky van de Geest Trustee 31/07/2021
Tom Hadfield Trustee 22/11/2019
Pou Te Rangomau Trustee 8/02/2019
Richard Aitken Trustee 30/11/2018
Amanda Mitchell Officer 7/08/2017
Sheila Monaghan Trustee 30/11/2016
Michelle Ann Jordan Trust Board Member 7/10/2016
Joel Philip Rowse Trustee 1/03/2016
Bronwyn Malcolm Trustee 11/03/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/10/2023 NOC020
8/09/2022 NOC018
8/09/2022 NOC017
14/05/2021 NOC015
7/10/2016 NOC009
7/10/2016 NOC008
5/10/2016 NOC007
19/07/2013 AR006
20/07/2012 AR005
7/06/2011 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.