Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


350 Aotearoa
CC41367
9429043189113
Registered

Registration details

14/07/2009
March 31

Address for service

98 St Heliers Bay Road
St Heliers
Auckland
1071

Charity's other details

022 4378715
https://www.facebook.com/350aotearoa/
https://twitter.com/350nz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To educate communities across New Zealand about the international climate crisis.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, International activities

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 31/12/2023 7/11/2023 $453,387 $154,829 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 18/09/2022 $227,899 $168,604 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 13/09/2021 $197,961 $152,036 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/11/2020 19/11/2020 $193,573 $180,628 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 30/10/2019 $166,179 $158,558 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 20/11/2018 $108,972 $91,534 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 13/12/2017 $99,850 $111,127 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $121,054 $104,432 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $45,456 $46,262 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Erica Brooks Board member 16/02/2024
Áine Kelly-Costello Board member 2/02/2024
Holly Beals Board member 2/02/2024
Kaeden Watts Board member 2/02/2024
Jonathon Brian Hagger Co-Chairperson 19/05/2022
Tania Sawicki Mead Co-Chairperson 19/05/2022
Roshni Mathew Treasurer 19/02/2021
Inangaro Vakaafi Board member 28/11/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Karen Swainson Secretary 31/03/2024
Sam Huggard Board member 14/02/2024
Naushyn Janah Board member 29/08/2023
Robert Barry Hobson Coates Board member 30/04/2023
Aaron Packard Chairperson 7/08/2021
Ayesha Nurain Janah Treasurer 28/11/2020
Matheson Russell Board Member 28/11/2020
Mary Moeono-Kolio Board member 1/08/2020
Joseph Moeono-Kolio Board Member 6/10/2019
Lina Elin Amanda Larsson Board member 31/03/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/04/2024 NOC034
16/02/2024 NOC033
4/09/2023 NOC031
25/05/2023 NOC030
10/03/2023 NOC029
19/09/2022 NOC027
21/08/2022 NOC026
13/08/2021 NOC024
8/04/2021 NOC023
7/12/2020 NOC022
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.