Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The International Society for Fluoride Research Incorporated
CC36709
9429043098675
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
International Society for Fluoride Research 30/06/2008
The International Society for Fluoride Research Incorporated 16/01/2009

Address for service

727 Brighton Road
Ocean View
Dunedin
9035

Charity's other details

(03)4811418
(03)4811418

Oceania

Australia

Africa

Egypt, Ethiopia, Nigeria, South Africa, South Sudan, Sudan, Tanzania, Tunisia

South America

Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Ecuador, Guyana, Paraguay, Peru, Suriname, Uruguay, Venezuela

North America

Canada, Cuba, Mexico, United States

Asia

Afghanistan, Bangladesh, Bhutan, Burma (Myanmar), China, India, Indonesia, Iran, Iraq, Japan, Malaysia, Maldives, Nepal, Pakistan, Saudi Arabia, Sri Lanka, Thailand, Turkey

Europe

Czech Republic, Denmark, Estonia, Finland, France, Germany, Greece, Hungary, Ireland, Italy, Netherlands, United Kingdom


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To publish research on fluoride and host conferences on fluoride research so that this information is available to the public and the scientific community so that sound decisions can be made concerning exposure to fluoride.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Publishes research on fluoride and hosts conferences on fluoride research)

Education / training / research

International activities

Other (please state)

(The scientific community), General public

Entity Structure

The entity is an incorporated society registered in New Zealand with elected officers who hold their positions on a voluntary basis.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 November 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 November 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 14/07/2023 $7,761 $3,079 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 11/08/2022 $7,803 $3,943 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 18/10/2021 $6,027 $5,363 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 10/06/2020 $6,671 $6,913 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 12/07/2019 $6,714 $8,833 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 4/07/2018 $3,708 $6,207 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 7/08/2017 $6,243 $4,581 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 4/09/2016 $8,363 $5,092 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 24/09/2015 $8,076 $7,637 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 15/07/2014 $9,672 $7,842 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Javed Ahsan Quadri First Vice President 29/09/2021
Muhammad Nauman Ahmad Regional editor for Pakistan and Afghanistan 1/01/2014
Shanti Lal Choubisa Regional editor for India 1/10/2013
Vikas K Desai Regional editor for India 1/10/2013
Yanhui Gao Regional editor for the People's Republic of China 1/10/2013
Zhi-Zhong Guan Associate Editor and Regional editor for the People's Republic of China 1/10/2013
Alfredo Rigalli Regional editor for Latin America, including Mexico, Central America, and Cuba 1/01/2013
Eli Dahi Regional editor for Africa 1/01/2013
Amir Mahvi Regional Editor for the Middle East, and Member-at-Large for Asia 8/09/2012
Andrzej Bohatyrewicz Member at Large for Europe 8/09/2012
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sunsanee Rajchagool President 10/11/2016
Gene Millar Member at Large for North America 4/09/2016
Guifan Sun Member at Large for Asia 4/09/2016
Humio Tsunoda Member at Large for Asia 4/09/2016
Jashwanti Sharma Associate Editor 4/09/2016
Jurgen Franke Member at Large for Europe 4/09/2016
Koichi Kono Member at Large for Asia 4/09/2016
Miklos Bely Member at Large for Europe 4/09/2016
Ming-ho Yu Assoc Editor 4/09/2016
Zygmunt Machoy Member at Large for Europe 4/09/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/10/2021 NOC019
5/09/2016 NOC012
21/09/2015 NOC010
21/09/2015 NOC009
15/07/2014 NOC008
14/09/2013 AR006
24/09/2012 NOC003
24/09/2012 AR005
15/08/2011 AR004
23/07/2010 AR003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.