Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Kiwi Trust
Save the Kiwi
CC47976
9429043233014
Registered

Registration details

4/27/2012
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 93504
Takapuna
Auckland
0740
72 Taharoto Road
Takapuna
Auckland
0622

Charity's other details

09 307 4878
www.facebook.com/savethekiwinz/
https://www.linkedin.com/company/save-the-kiwi


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

VISION From endangered to everywhere MISSION To enable kiwi to flourish in their natural habitat forever by supporting kiwi conservation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Environment / conservation

Care / protection of animals

Animals

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

Administration by Board of Trustees The trust shall be administered by a Board comprising the Trustees. The Board of Trustee will be responsible for furthering the objectives of the Trust and for declaring general policy relating to the implementation of the objectives of the Trust. The Trustees may appoint an Executive Director. The Executive Director will oversee the day to day operations and management of the Trust, subject to the ultimate direction and control of trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
6/30/2023 12/31/2023 11/29/2023 $6,141,825 $5,998,988 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2022 12/31/2022 11/28/2022 $7,378,998 $7,034,815 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2021 12/31/2021 10/26/2021 $7,255,677 $6,521,637 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2020 12/31/2020 11/9/2020 $2,444,314 $2,576,361 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2019 12/31/2019 10/7/2019 $1,853,154 $1,977,373 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2018 12/31/2018 10/30/2018 $1,657,952 $1,565,222 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2017 12/31/2017 11/9/2017 $1,665,861 $1,398,741 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2016 12/31/2016 12/6/2016 $1,195,109 $1,005,026 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2015 12/31/2015 10/21/2015 $894,734 $810,837 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2014 12/31/2014 8/25/2014 $638,936 $760,076 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Joe Harawira Trustee 8/31/2023
Alistair Bruce Ryan Trustee 9/1/2021
Henry John Brandts-Giesen Trustee 2/1/2021
Jennifer Ann Fenwick Trustee 1/1/2020
Richard Leggat Executive Chair 4/1/2019
Kate Graeme Trustee 2/23/2018
Rudolf Hendrik Kleinpastle Trustee 9/5/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Thomas Ford Malcolm Trustee 8/31/2023
Miriama Kamo Trustee 5/1/2023
Evan Christopher Williams Trustee 9/30/2021
Peter Damien Cullinane Trustee 9/30/2021
John Alexander McLennan Trustee 5/31/2021
Timothy John MacAvoy Trustee 6/30/2020
Robert George Mappin Fenwick Trustee 4/1/2019
Sunil Kumar Unka Trustee 11/21/2017
Graham Wall Trustee 2/28/2017
Lou Sanson Trustee 2/28/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/4/2023 NOC039
9/12/2022 NOC036
6/7/2022 NOC035
3/30/2022 NOC032
12/9/2021 NOC030
10/26/2021 NOC028
9/20/2021 NOC027
9/6/2021 NOC026
7/28/2021 NOC025
4/2/2019 NOC022
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.