pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Bethesda Village Limited
CC26845
9429033853017
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 76900
South Auckland Mail Centre
Manukau City
2290
53 Inverell Avenue
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details



Group Members


Below are all the members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Adventist Development and Relief Agency
Bethesda Care Limited
Bethesda Village Limited
LHF Limited
New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Health Association Limited
New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Aged Care Services

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

Part of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church in New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2011 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2010 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hartley Holtzhauzen Director 1/07/2019
Shane Palipane Director 9/11/2010
Ben Timothy Helfritz Director 20/09/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jonathan Edwin Marshall Director 30/06/2019
Edward Tupai Director 1/08/2018
Graham Ure Director 30/09/2016
Michael George Ambrose Director 31/12/2013
Russell Lewis Jones Director 9/11/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/10/2019 NOC006
13/01/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents