pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Raetihi Promotions Charitable Trust
CC42834
9429042936091
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 106
Raetihi
4646
C/- Information Centre
46 Seddon Street
Raetihi
4632

Charity's other details

06 3854759


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Raetihi Promotions Charitable Trust aims to develop the town of Raetihi by promoting it to the larger New Zealand public by creating new and enhancing existing attractions and business opportunities. The Trust also aims to promote the well-being and community spirit of the residents of Raetihi. It acts as an umbrella for community activities and operates the Raetihi Information Centre with the assistance of a grant from the Ruapehu Council. Raetihi Promotions has run a number of very successful events in Raetihi now for a number of years which include - Waimarino Art Awards, Christmas Carnival, Gutbuster, Wild Food Challenge and they are also creating walkways in the town.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people

Entity Structure

Trustees - Chairman, Secretary, Treasurer, Solicitor 9 in total.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 10/11/2021 $82,730 $61,851
30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $130,700 $100,891
30/09/2019 17/11/2019 $87,494 $65,176
30/09/2018 24/09/2018 $95,074 $81,663
30/09/2017 10/10/2017 $97,783 $48,135
30/09/2016 25/07/2016 $38,912 $35,403
30/09/2015 29/03/2016 $53,372 $50,355
30/09/2014 12/03/2015 $27,684 $23,825
30/09/2013 12/11/2013 $50,230 $50,843

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Geoffrey Morris Anderson Chair 3/08/2020
Helen Mary Cussins Secretary 3/08/2020
Catherine Louise Rogers Trustee 1/03/2020
Joanna Jordan Trust Solicitor 1/07/2015
Donna Journeaux Treasurer 1/07/2012
Noeline May Churton Trustee 1/06/2008
Sally Greer Trustee 2/08/1977
John Cyrus Chapman Trustee 2/08/1921
Richard Anthony Bryce Trustee 2/08/1921

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Deborah Raewyn Clunie Trustee 22/10/2020
Gary Griffin-Chappel Chairman 1/05/2020
Robert Williams Trustee 1/04/2020
Lucy Bernadette Conway Secretary 1/08/2019
Robyn Laura-Lee Stevenson Trustee 1/08/2019
Brenton Philip Barker Trustee 1/04/2019
Tina May Marama Wallace Trustee 4/02/2019
Rachel Pamela Hoskin Trustee 3/02/2019
Geoffrey Morris Anderson Trustee 31/03/2018
Jackie Reo Rapana Trustee 31/03/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/10/2020 NOC018
8/04/2019 NOC015
8/04/2019 NOC014
14/02/2019 NOC012
9/08/2015 NOC008
27/02/2015 NOC007
12/09/2012 AR005
3/05/2012 NOC003
27/09/2011 AR004
17/02/2011 AR003

Charity Documents