pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kidney Health New Zealand Incorporated
CC11348
9429042748090
Registered

Registration details

14/10/2007
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
New Zealand Kidney Foundation 15/10/2007
Kidney Health New Zealand Incorporated 31/01/2008

Address for service

PO Box 20072
Bishopdale
Christchurch
8543
6F Sir William Pickering Drive
337 Harewood Road
Burnside
Christchurch
8053

Charity's other details

021 618615
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/Kidney-Health-New-Zealand-206096806091572/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/kidneyhealthnz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

a. To be the national voice for people with kidney disease and their families; b. To establish Kidney Health NZ as a primary source of reliable and relevant Information on the prevention and management of kidney disease; c. To be a leading advocate for world class kidney healthcare in New Zealand; d. To commission, fund and/or disseminate research in support of Objects 4.1 – 4.3 above; e. To do all such other acts and things incidental to the support and best interests of people affected by kidney disease and the attainment of these objects.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The Board is responsible for: The governance of Kidney Health NZ comprises up to 7 Board Members elected annually by the Board and approved at an AGM. The GM & Medical Advisor meet with the board but are not board members. The board monitor and review the performance of KHNZ against an approved strategic plan, annual plan and budget; Approving annual financial statements; Fostering interaction and communication across the Kidney Health NZ family and others involved with Kidney Health NZ

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 8/09/2021 $232,605 $554,716
30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $420,891 $401,867
30/09/2019 11/10/2019 $227,635 $425,421
30/09/2018 10/10/2018 $271,619 $418,976
30/09/2017 27/11/2017 $521,707 $510,882
30/09/2016 4/10/2016 $476,002 $555,292
30/09/2015 28/09/2015 $448,409 $144,379
30/09/2014 7/08/2014 $319,041 $424,944
30/09/2013 4/09/2013 $855,429 $311,003

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jo-Anne Marie Denvir Board member 14/10/2021
Fale Andrew Lesa Board Member 22/04/2021
Mara Angela Fisher Board member 22/04/2021
Christine Prince Board Memeber 28/11/2019
Michael Kevin Campbell General Manager 15/07/2019
Traci Stanbury Board Member 14/12/2018
David Shearer Board Member 7/11/2018
John Kearns Board Member 7/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nicholas Raymond Polaschek Board Member 14/10/2021
Michael Papesch Board Member 26/11/2020
Natalie Brown Treasurer 26/11/2020
Richard Robson Treasurer 28/10/2019
Ellen Carmel Gregan-Ford Acting Chief Executive 2/08/2019
Maxwell Reid Chief Executive Officer 18/12/2018
David Neil Henderson Chairman 7/11/2018
Humphry Rolleston Board Member 7/11/2018
Nora Van Der Schrieck Board Member 7/11/2018
Colin Hutchison Medical Advisor 31/07/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/10/2021 NOC026
29/06/2021 NOC024
1/06/2021 NOC023
5/05/2021 NOC022
24/02/2021 NOC021
8/06/2020 NOC019
27/03/2020 NOC018
18/12/2019 NOC017
26/09/2019 NOC015
20/02/2019 NOC014

Charity Documents