Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Siddhartha's Intent NZ
CC60643
N/A
Registered

Registration details

20/10/2022
March 31

Address for service

56 Park Terrace
Corsair Bay
Lyttelton
8082

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote and advance the religion of Buddhism.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 21/08/2024 $538,729 $424,364 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 17/10/2023 $76,541 $17,607 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Huey-Mei Chen Secretary and Trustee 15/03/2025
Ian Moore Chair & Trustee 15/03/2025
Kimberley Alice Nicole Saxton Director and Trustee 17/10/2022
Xueli Sun Treasurer and Trustee 17/10/2022
Hannah Huia Hegan Ngatai Trustee 13/04/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/05/2025 NOC007
14/05/2025 NOC006
14/05/2025 NOC005
14/05/2025 NOC004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.