pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Breast Cancer Aotearoa Coalition Incorporated
CC22456
9429043170364
Registered

Registration details

2/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 90224
Victoria Street West
Auckland
1142
5 Fitzroy Street
Ponsonby
Auckland
1021

Charity's other details

021 990244
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/BreastCancerAotearoaCoalition
Twitter icon image
@BCACNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To make world-class detection, treatment and care accessible to all those affected by breast cancer in Aotearoa, New Zealand. To provide information and support to empower those with breast cancer to make informed choices about their treatment and care. To provide a voice for New Zealanders who have experienced breast cancer.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Type of Entity and Legal Basis: An incorporated society established under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908 and registered as a Charity on 3 April 2008. Certificate of Incorporation : 1897085 IRD/Exemption Number: 95-344-461 Registration Number: CC22456 The BCAC operates according to a formal Constitution.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 27/09/2023 $420,312 $40,339
30/09/2022 15/09/2022 $70,621 $44,265
30/09/2021 20/09/2021 $45,592 $54,239
30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $42,057 $76,070
30/09/2019 18/09/2019 $146,701 $91,050
30/09/2018 24/09/2018 $67,212 $55,644
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $63,518 $75,316
30/09/2016 24/10/2016 $18,798 $76,075
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $100,808 $103,652
30/09/2014 30/08/2014 $277,975 $128,831

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Marion Ruth Barnett Committee Member 8/05/2023
Rachel Marie Greenwood Committee Member 8/05/2023
Ah-Leen Sharryn Rayner Committee Member 8/11/2022
Denise Margaret Lemmen Committee Member 8/11/2022
Linda Mataniu Fatialofa Committee Member 8/03/2022
Belinda Rose Tran-Lawrence Committee Member 9/02/2022
Sarah Victoria Emma Cato Committee Member 9/02/2022
Maria Violet Marama Committee Member 18/10/2021
Tanya A Newman Committee Member 13/07/2021
Catrin A Devonald Committee member 11/08/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Teresa Ann Maize Committee Member 16/10/2022
Gillian Wintrup Committee member 20/07/2022
Elisa Jane Lavelle Wijohn Committee Member 5/06/2022
Irene Rangianewa Kereama-Royal Committee member 11/05/2021
Joanna Larsen-Harris Committee Member 12/04/2019
Nicola Russell Committee member 10/07/2018
Melissa Bell Committee member 11/05/2018
Rosalind Day Committee Member 23/03/2018
Christine Walsh Committee member 9/11/2017
Moana Papa Committee Member 1/02/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/05/2023 NOC037
14/12/2022 NOC036
21/07/2022 NOC034
12/06/2022 NOC033
18/03/2022 NOC032
23/02/2022 NOC031
3/12/2021 NOC030
21/10/2021 NOC029
14/07/2021 NOC027
24/05/2021 NOC026

Charity Documents