pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Hepatitis Foundation of New Zealand
CC21669
9429042868125
Registered

Registration details

9/03/2008
June 30

Address for service

THE HEPATITIS FOUNDATION OF NEW ZEALAND
PO Box 647
Whakatane
3158
THE HEPATITIS FOUNDATION OF NEW ZEALAND
61 Alexander Avenue
Whakatane
3120

Charity's other details

(07)3071259
(07)3071266


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To carry out research into liver diseases, to provide measures for treatment and prevention of liver diseases and to provide education and information relating to hepatitis matters

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

A Charitable Trust with 7 trustees which meets on a regular basis to deal with matters relating to the treatment and prevention of liver diseases, research into liver diseases, dissemination of information and education, sponsorship of meetings and workshops and programmes to identify carriers of the hepatitis B virus. The Foundation employs 23 staff in Whakatane and elsewhere to fulfill its functions

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 14/12/2021 $1,947,646 $1,972,923
31/12/2020 16/12/2020 $1,925,460 $2,327,011
31/12/2019 18/12/2019 $1,991,504 $2,377,166
31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $8,274,620 $2,483,316
31/12/2017 4/12/2017 $2,824,336 $3,397,718
31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $2,939,053 $3,611,850
31/12/2015 16/11/2015 $3,847,188 $3,711,012
31/12/2014 26/01/2015 $4,341,758 $3,236,166
31/12/2013 9/01/2014 $3,972,789 $2,687,280

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Kataraina Rolleston Trustee 3/12/2020
Richard William Rainger Chairman 16/12/2019
Stephen John Napier Trustee 27/06/2011
Edward John Gane Trustee 20/02/2003
Brian John Ritchie Trustee 31/05/2001
Christine Chambers Trustee 31/07/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Frank Weilert Trustee 16/09/2021
Richard Milgrew Power Trustee 3/12/2020
Christopher William Cunningham Chairman 26/03/2020
Robert Lane Chappell Trustee 20/06/2014
Doreen HereHere McCorkindale Trustee 23/07/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/03/2022 NOC022
14/01/2021 NOC020
2/04/2020 NOC018
2/04/2020 NOC017
19/03/2020 NOC016
13/12/2019 NOC015
31/10/2019 NOC014
19/11/2015 NOC009
22/07/2014 NOC008
22/07/2014 NOC007

Charity Documents