pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Canterbury West Coast Air Rescue Trust
CC23893
9429042610069
Registered

Registration details

4/05/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 20262
Bishopdale
Christchurch
8543
73 Grays Road
Harewood Aviation Park
Yaldhurst
Christchurch
8042

Charity's other details

03 358 8244
03 358 0944
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/CWCairrescue/?hc_ref=SEARCH&fref=nf


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To contract, fund and promote air rescue and air ambulance services in the Canterbury and West Coast regions of the South Island. This involves fundraising and other activities supporting the provision of the Westpac Rescue Helicopter (Canterbury), the New Zealand Coal and Carbon Rescue Helicopter (West Coast) and related air ambulance services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(community fundraising for rescue helicopter services in the Canterbury and West Coast regions)

Fund-raising

People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups, general public - anyone needing emergency hospital transport

Entity Structure

Incorporated Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 20/12/2021 $7,719,002 $5,784,522
31/12/2020 14/12/2020 $5,723,920 $5,314,130
31/12/2019 2/12/2019 $6,181,086 $6,179,174
31/12/2018 13/12/2018 $7,482,171 $7,162,057
31/12/2017 28/11/2017 $8,209,263 $6,821,082
31/12/2016 23/11/2016 $6,857,869 $6,255,686
31/12/2015 2/12/2015 $6,865,859 $6,811,014
31/12/2014 29/10/2014 $6,705,465 $6,114,756
31/12/2013 15/10/2013 $5,692,818 $636,661
31/12/2012 13/11/2012 $5,361,526 $387,707

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Daniel Schroder Trustee 11/08/2021
Christopher John Weir Trustee 24/06/2020
Murray Willocks Chairman 6/09/2018
Peter William Jensen Trustee 6/09/2018
Warren Charles Gilbertson Trustee 6/09/2018
Barry John Bragg Deputy Chairman 16/07/2002
David Stanley Duns Treasurer 18/11/1998
Murray Alan Weakley Trustee 18/11/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Barrie Cooper Trustee 11/12/2019
Ivan Campbell Trustee 8/12/2017
Trevor Colin Watts Deputy Chairman West Coast 8/12/2017
Tracey Chambers Trustee 31/01/2017
Jack Bertram Renton Trustee 3/12/2015
Neil Blanchfield Deputy Chairman Canterbury 27/07/2015
Jan Christine Coll Deputy Chairman - West Coast 16/11/2010
John Andrew Sturgeon Trustee 13/12/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/08/2021 NOC026
9/07/2021 NOC025
17/11/2020 NOC023
14/10/2020 NOC022
18/02/2020 NOC021
18/02/2020 NOC020
18/12/2019 NOC019
3/12/2019 NOC017
30/08/2019 NOC016
27/11/2018 NOC014

Charity Documents