Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Outline Aotearoa Incorporated
OutLine NZ, Gayline/Lesbianline
CC29680
9429042586951
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Outline New Zealand Incorporated 3/04/2008
Auckland Gay And Lesbian Welfare Group Incorporated 30/06/2008
Outline Aotearoa Incorporated 23/06/2021

Address for service

PO Box 147663
Ponsonby
Auckland
1144
Level 2
31-35 Hargreaves Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details

09 281 3409
https://www.facebook.com/OUTlineAotearoa
https://twitter.com/OUTlineAotearoa
https://www.instagram.com/OUTlineAotearoa


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support, affirm and advance the rainbow communities of Aotearoa to achieve successful outcomes by: - providing programmes which cater to social, educational and emotional needs - advocating for social, cultural and legal rights - nurturing and providing resources to meet community aspirations

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Promotion of volunteering, Counselling

Other (please state)

(Rainbow communities (including gay, lesbian, bisexual, transgender, intersex, queer, takatāpui and other sex, sexuality and gender minorities))

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 31/10/2024 25/10/2024 $652,554 $605,334 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 11/08/2023 $555,110 $586,868 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 22/08/2022 $494,023 $402,777 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 1/09/2021 $343,105 $299,109 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 17/09/2020 $198,050 $223,615 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 4/09/2019 $182,810 $205,392 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 13/09/2018 $231,154 $228,017 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 2/08/2017 $198,209 $211,007 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 24/08/2016 $184,427 $172,238 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Filipo Katavake-McGrath Treasurer 5/09/2024
Allyssa Verner-Pula Board Member 19/06/2024
Jordan Walker Board Member 30/08/2023
Ranmalie Jayasinha Board Member 29/06/2022
Shane Kelly Co-Chairperson 29/06/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Emmaline Pickering-Martin Chief Executive 8/05/2025
Grace Abbott Co-Chairperson 30/01/2025
Bradley Goodyear Treasurer 19/06/2024
Louise Chan Board Member 19/06/2024
Luca Bree Secretary 19/06/2024
Samuel Clack Board Member 19/06/2024
Claire Black Chief Executive 15/12/2023
Danika Plowman Secretary 28/06/2023
Moira Clunie Co-Chairperson 28/06/2023
Tunisia Ārena Board Member 28/06/2023
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/05/2025 NOC045
11/02/2025 NOC044
30/01/2025 NOC043
24/09/2024 NOC041
23/09/2024 NOC040
14/03/2024 NOC039
1/11/2023 NOC038
28/07/2023 NOC036
27/07/2023 NOC035
7/12/2022 NOC033
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.