Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Outline Aotearoa Incorporated
OutLine NZ, Gayline/Lesbianline
CC29680
9429042586951
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Outline New Zealand Incorporated 3/04/2008
Auckland Gay And Lesbian Welfare Group Incorporated 30/06/2008
Outline Aotearoa Incorporated 23/06/2021

Address for service

PO Box 147663
Ponsonby
Auckland
1144
Level 2
31-35 Hargreaves Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details

09 281 3409
https://www.facebook.com/OUTlineAotearoa
https://twitter.com/OUTlineAotearoa
https://www.instagram.com/OUTlineAotearoa


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support, affirm and advance the rainbow communities of Aotearoa to achieve successful outcomes by: - providing programmes which cater to social, educational and emotional needs - advocating for social, cultural and legal rights - nurturing and providing resources to meet community aspirations

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Promotion of volunteering, Counselling

Other (please state)

(Rainbow communities (including gay, lesbian, bisexual, transgender, intersex, queer, takatāpui and other sex, sexuality and gender minorities))

Entity Structure

Incorporated society governed by an elected board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 11/08/2023 $555,110 $586,868 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 22/08/2022 $494,023 $402,777 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 1/09/2021 $343,105 $299,109 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 17/09/2020 $198,050 $223,615 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 4/09/2019 $182,810 $205,392 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 13/09/2018 $231,154 $228,017 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 2/08/2017 $198,209 $211,007 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 24/08/2016 $184,427 $172,238 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 25/11/2015 $187,615 $177,828 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 27/11/2014 $126,204 $128,655 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jordan Walker Board Member 30/08/2023
Samuel Clack Board Member 28/06/2023
Louise Chan Board Member 6/12/2022
Bradley Goodyear Treasurer 29/06/2022
Ranmalie Jayasinha Board Member 29/06/2022
Shane Kelly Co-Chairperson 29/06/2022
Luca Bree Secretary 22/04/2021
Grace Abbott Co-Chairperson 24/06/2020
Claire Black Chief Executive 11/11/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Danika Plowman Secretary 28/06/2023
Moira Clunie Co-Chairperson 28/06/2023
Tunisia Ārena Board Member 28/06/2023
Aych Mcardle Co-Chairperson 29/06/2022
Frances Colette Arns Treasurer 29/06/2022
Richard Te Akau Board Member 26/10/2021
Robert Sykes Secretary 28/03/2021
Leah Jennens Secretary 3/11/2020
Kara Rosemeier Board Member 24/06/2020
Stace Robertson Board Member 24/06/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/11/2023 NOC038
28/07/2023 NOC036
27/07/2023 NOC035
7/12/2022 NOC033
29/11/2021 NOC030
25/06/2021 NOC027
13/05/2021 NOC026
16/04/2021 NOC025
3/12/2020 NOC024
19/07/2019 NOC021
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.