pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pest Free Kaipatiki Restoration Society incorporated
Pest Free Kaipatiki
CC55334
9429046428028
Registered

Registration details

6/04/2018
June 30

Address for service

63 Hadfield Street
Beach Haven
Auckland
0626

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/groups/PestFreeKaipatiki/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Reduce animal, plant and disease pests, other threats and restore biodiversity Increase community awareness, education, involvement and community connectivity Increase regional strategies and connections, collaboration and ecological linkages

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

The BOARD has a role of oversight of the activities, finances and the direction of the organisation. The EXECUTIVE is a small off-shoot of the Board dealing with employment of staff, finance and day to day issues. Other committees deal with communication and engagement and technical advice, the schools programme and particular initiatives underway at the moment such the Predator Blitz and the Chew Card campaign

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
29/02/2020 3/05/2020 $230,489 $224,163
31/12/2018 26/12/2018 $148,185 $155,337

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angela Mueller Board member 11/11/2019
Mandy Tracey Osborne Board member 11/11/2019
Angela Smith Treasurer 12/11/2018
David Wayne Roberts Board Member 25/09/2017
Joan Knight Chair 25/09/2017
Keith Winstone Salmon Secretary 25/09/2017
Nicholas Jonathan Reynolds Board Member 25/09/2017
Richard Hugh Gallen Board Member 25/09/2017
Richard John Hursthouse Board Member 25/09/2017
Stuart Gregory Barton Deputy Chair 25/09/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Janet Anne Cole Deputy Chair 11/11/2019
Kelly Marie Hayward Board Member 11/11/2019
Petra Jane Kent Board Member 11/11/2019
Annette Francis Sachtleben Board Member 29/10/2018
Michael Sumner Board Member 29/10/2018
Susan Banbury Co-Treasurer 29/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/11/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents