Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


RUFF AS GUTZ Charitable Trust
RUFF AS GUTZ Charitable Trust
CC61242
N/A
Registered

Registration details

10/05/2023
April 30

Address for service

Unit 2
12 Stanley Street
Berhampore
Wellington
6023

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charitable purpose of this Trust is “to benefit the wider community by presenting and promoting high quality performance in the community, and providing a platform for emerging and established performers to practise their craft. In addition, the Trust will aim to develop new and groundbreaking performance work, with the intent to develop the performance landscape in Aotearoa New Zealand”

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Entity Structure

We have our office based in Wellington. Our deed states that we must have between two and eight Trusteers. We have seven Trustees that constitute our governance board, including Creative Producer, Secretary, Wellbeing Officer, Treasurer and three Wet Rag Trustee positions as outlined in the deed.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/04/2024 31/10/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Barker Wet Rag 17/04/2023
Emma Rattenbury Secretary 17/04/2023
Jacob Banks Treasurer 17/04/2023
Jeremy Hunt Wellbeing Officer 17/04/2023
Mia Oudes Wet Rag 17/04/2023
Rebekah de Roo Wet Rag 17/04/2023
Sean Burnett Dugdale-Martin The Settlor Creative Producer 17/04/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/05/2024 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.