Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


NZ Foundation for Mast Cell Activation Disorders
Mast Cell NZ
CC51934
N/A
Registered

Registration details

11/06/2015
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Mastocytosis Network of New Zealand 11/06/2015
NZ Foundation for Mast Cell Activation Disorders 3/12/2016

Address for service

25 Olympus Way
Richmond
7020

Charity's other details

021349949
https://web.facebook.com/groups/mastcellnzsupport/?ref=bookmarks&_rdc=10&_rdr


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing advice, information and advocacy for patients and medical professionals around NZ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau, NZ health care professionals

Entity Structure

We have 2 co-chairpersons

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 7/08/2023 $130 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 19/10/2022 $253 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 19/11/2021 $422 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 14/08/2020 $30 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 14/09/2019 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $0 $245 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 26/04/2018 $1,950 $1,200 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 3/10/2016 $3,231 $3,229 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michaela Ariane Wensley Co-Chair 6/01/2019
Tania Leslie Bray Co-chair 1/10/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dr. Sarah Jane Coddington-Lawson Co-chair 11/02/2019
Cynthia Suzanne Knight Co-Chairperson 21/11/2018
Peter Trevor Wright Treasurer 30/09/2018
Samantha Jane Featherstone Co-Chairperson 30/09/2018
Jo Reid Co-Chairperson 4/09/2018
Catherine Ryan Treasurer 10/12/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/03/2021 NOC030
14/02/2019 NOC027
11/02/2019 NOC026
6/01/2019 NOC025
5/12/2018 NOC024
29/11/2018 NOC023
22/11/2018 NOC022
21/11/2018 NOC021
2/10/2018 NOC020
2/10/2018 NOC018
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.